Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lino Bortolo Belotti, C.M.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo, Italy

Titular Bishop of Tabla

Titular See: (Comunità Missionaria del Paradiso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1930Born
12 Jun 195423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
15 May 199968.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bergamo, Italy
15 May 199968.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabla
29 Jun 199968.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabla
22 Jan 200978.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bergamo, Italy
23 Mar 201887.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lino Bortolo Belotti
Bishop Lino Bortolo Belotti C.M.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComenduno
Ordained BishopSan Alessandro Martire, Cathedral, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo
Death PlaceScanzorosciate

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,574
  • d: CB, 23 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 23 Mar 2018