Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armando Giuseppe Brambilla

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Iomnium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1942Born
1975²32.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bergamo, Italy
11 Jun 197735.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
25 Mar 199452.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
25 Mar 199452.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Iomnium
7 May 199452.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iomnium
24 Dec 201169.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Armando Giuseppe Brambilla
Bishop Armando Giuseppe Brambilla (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCologno Monzese

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,315
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast