Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Bascopé Müller, S.D.B.

Bishop of Bolivia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1962 BornSanta Cruz de la Sierra
22 Aug 198725.3Solemn ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Sep 199129.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Jul 201048.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of El Alto, Bolivia
15 Jul 201048.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Naratcata
9 Sep 201048.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naratcata
24 Sep 201452.4AppointedBishop of Bolivia, Military
17 Jan 201552.7InstalledBishop of Bolivia, Military

MicroData Summary for Fernando Bascopé Müller:
Bishop Fernando Bascopé Müller S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Bolivia, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Bolivia, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,786
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2014
  • i: CB, 18 Jan 20105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 19 Jan 2015