Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Ignacio de Velasco

Dioecesis Sancti Ignatii Velascani



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Carlos Stetter, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 November 1994
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bolivia
  • Square Kilometers: 197,000 (76,091 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Plaza 31 de Julio, San Ignacio de Velasco, Dept. Santa Cruz, Bolivia
  • Telephone: (03)962.2011
  • Fax: 962.2010

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Chiquitos
27 January 1930ErectedDiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra Vicariate Apostolic of Chiquitos (erected)
13 December 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Chiquitos Vicariate Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez (erected)
Diocese of San Ignacio de Velasco
3 November 1994ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chiquitos Diocese of San Ignacio de Velasco

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Chiquitos
194843,13743,39199.4%18182,3961018ap1951
196648,65050,00097.3%24242,027367516ap1967
197054,00055,00098.2%24242,2504285ap1971
197670,00074,00094.6%328312,258437118ap1977
198071,40074,80095.5%423272,644397917ap1981
1990106,000113,00093.8%1025353,028429819ap1991
Diocese of San Ignacio de Velasco
1999165,000180,00091.7%1811295,689188821ap2000
2000165,000180,00091.7%1911305,500188821ap2001
2001185,000200,00092.5%1811296,379188521ap2002
2002180,000200,00090.0%1715325,625247621ap2003
2003200,000220,00090.9%1716336,060256821ap2004
2004200,000220,00090.9%1716336,060266222ap2005
2010220,000245,00089.8%1613297,586145622ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 2 Aug 2012