Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Calasanz Rosenhammer, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chiquitos, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Ampora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1900Born
27 Jul 192323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 May 194949.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chiquitos, Bolivia
12 May 194949.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ampora
21 Aug 194949.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ampora
21 Aug 197474.6RetiredVicar Apostolic of Chiquitos, Bolivia
26 Apr 2003103.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chiquitos, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for José Calasanz Rosenhammer
Bishop José Calasanz Rosenhammer O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chiquitos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMauerkirchen

  • a priest for 79.7 years
  • a bishop for 53.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 70
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast