Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of La Paz

Archidioecesis Pacensis in Bolivia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 June 1943
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Bolivia
  • Square Kilometers: 10,975 (4,239 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzobispadolapaz.org/
  • Mailing Address: Calle Ballivian 1277, Casilla 259, La Paz, Bolivia
  • Telephone: (02)341-920; 370-241; 351-253
  • Fax: 391-244

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of La Paz
4 July 1605ErectedDiocese of La Plata o Charcas Diocese of La Paz (erected)
Archdiocese of La Paz
18 June 1943ElevatedDiocese of La Paz Archdiocese of La Paz
25 December 1949Territory LostArchdiocese of La Paz Territorial Prelature of Corocoro (erected)
7 November 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of La Paz Territorial Prelature of Coroico (erected)
25 June 1994Territory LostArchdiocese of La Paz Diocese of El Alto (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of La Paz
1950980,0001,000,00098.0%48861347,313102234122ap1951
1966850,0001,000,00085.0%491311804,72219531477ap1967
1968800,0001,200,00066.7%571502073,864165457492ap1971
19761,429,7501,505,00095.0%601381987,220718335574ap1977
19801,628,0001,809,00090.0%571301878,7051017636874ap1981
19902,286,0002,504,00091.3%5713719411,7831629123786ap1991
1999860,000974,00088.3%58821406,142312226354ap2000
2000937,4001,061,60088.3%56781346,995312827055ap2001
20011,021,7661,160,68388.0%68811496,857313529055ap2002
20021,109,9781,265,14587.7%72841567,115313630055ap2003
20031,206,7691,369,64588.1%64801448,380313131053ap2004
20041,292,8721,474,15087.7%62911538,450315233253ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Dec 2014