Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alejandro Mestre Descals, S.J. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Sucre

Titular Archbishop of Tigisi in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1912BornCuart de Poblet, Spain
30 Jul 194330.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Mar 197663.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sucre, Bolivia
6 Mar 197663.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
1 May 197663.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
28 Jun 198269.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of La Paz, Bolivia
28 Jun 198269.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
24 Feb 198774.2RetiredCoadjutor Archbishop of La Paz, Bolivia
26 Jun 198875.5DiedCoadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Mestre Descals:
Archbishop Alejandro Mestre Descals S.J. (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Sucre

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013