Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín de Montalvo Calderon de la Barca, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹Born
21 Jul 166454.5AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
22 Jan 166858.0Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
Dec 1668³58.9DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín de Montalvo Calderon de la Barca
Bishop Martín de Montalvo Calderon de la Barca O.S.A. (born 1610, died Dec 1668) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Death PlaceSanta Cruz

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 270
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 199, Number 1,248
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 60
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 Jul 2019

Quantcast