Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hernando de Arias y Ugarte

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1561BornBogota
22 Apr 161351.6AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
28 Sep 161453.0Ordained BishopBishop of Quito, Ecuador
14 Mar 161654.5AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
15 Apr 162462.5AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
30 Jul 162563.8ResignedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
4 Mar 162866.4SelectedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
29 May 162866.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
14 Feb 163068.4InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
27 Jan 163876.3DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Hernando de Arias y Ugarte:
Archbishop Hernando de Arias y Ugarte (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,380
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 290, and Page 187
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 282, and Page 221
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 12 Mar 2015