Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Feliciano de la Vega Padilla

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582²Born
10 Feb 163149.1AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
21 Dec 163149.9Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
5 Sep 163351.6AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
13 Sep 163856.6AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
Dec 164058.9DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Feliciano de la Vega Padilla
Archbishop Feliciano de la Vega Padilla (born 1582, died Dec 1640) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Peru
Death PlaceWhile Traveling, between Acapulco and Mazatlan

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 241, and Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 18
  • by/d.loc: CB, 5 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast