Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonel de Cervantes y Caravajal

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Mar 1621AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
15 Jul 1622Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
1 Dec 1625AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
17 Dec 1629AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
26 Jun 1631InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Feb 1636AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
1637²DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonel de Cervantes y Caravajal:
Bishop Leonel de Cervantes y Caravajal (died 1637) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,633
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85, and Page 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 198, and Page 233
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015