Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchor Maldonado y Saavedra, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹Born
20 Sep 163143.7SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
8 Mar 163244.1ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
1633¹45.0Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
27 Jun 163547.4InstalledBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
11 Feb 166274.1DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melchor Maldonado y Saavedra
Bishop Melchor Maldonado y Saavedra O.S.A. (born 1588, died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRío de la Hacha

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 348
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018