Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Calixto Maria Clavijo Salazar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Paz, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Limyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1814Born
6 Jul 183924.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Paz, Bolivia
7 Jul 183924.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Paz, Bolivia
24 Sep 186853.9AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
11 Apr 186954.4Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
7 May 186954.5InstalledBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
27 Apr 187459.5ResignedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
4 May 187459.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
11 Jun 188671.6DiedBishop Emeritus of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Calixto Maria Clavijo Salazar
Bishop Calixto Maria Clavijo Salazar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarabuco, Diocese of La Paz
Ordained BishopPuno, Diocese of Puno, Peru

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 343, and Page 433
  • b: LB, 6 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018