Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco de Paula León de Aguirre Velasco

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1790Born
29 Mar 181828.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 183747.2AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
13 Jul 184050.4ResignedBishop-Elect of La Paz, Bolivia
13 Jul 184050.4AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula León de Aguirre Velasco (VIAF: 283184770)
Father Francisco de Paula León de Aguirre Velasco (born ) Former Bishop-Elect of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lorenzo della Barranca

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,845
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 168, and Page 295
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,837

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast