Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan María Ambrosio Huerta Galván

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1823BornLima
18 Apr 184723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
2 Nov 186440.9SelectedBishop of Puno, Peru
27 Mar 186541.3ConfirmedBishop of Puno, Peru
25 Jun 186541.5Ordained BishopBishop of Puno, Peru
19 Mar 186642.3InstalledBishop of Puno, Peru
23 Jun 187551.5ResignedBishop of Puno, Peru
20 Aug 188056.7AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
23 Dec 188057.0InstalledBishop of Arequipa, Peru
27 Jun 189773.6DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan María Ambrosio Huerta Galván:
Bishop Juan María Ambrosio Huerta Galván (born , died ) Bishop of Arequipa

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 119, and Page 472
  • b: LB, 6 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013