Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Ezequiel Moreyra

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1826Born
22 Dec 184923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
2 Nov 186438.5SelectedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
27 Mar 186538.9ConfirmedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
6 Aug 186539.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
23 Mar 187447.9DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Ezequiel Moreyra (VIAF: 250713841)
Bishop José Francisco Ezequiel Moreyra (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopS. Anna, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 24.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 309
  • opd/c1: LB, 26 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017