Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Puno

Dioecesis Puniensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 7 October 1861
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Arequipa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 19,475 (7,522 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 93, Jr. Conde de Lemos 226, Puno, Peru
  • Telephone: (054) 35-1761
  • Fax: 35-3481

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
7 October 1861ErectedDiocese of Cuzco Diocese of Puno (erected)
3 August 1957Territory LostDiocese of Puno Territorial Prelature of Juli (erected)
30 July 1958Territory LostDiocese of Puno Territorial Prelature of Ayaviri (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950799,000800,00099.9%30184816,645233472ap1951
1966297,000305,00097.4%2030505,940505113ap1967
1968310,000319,28097.1%1435496,3262494817ap1971
1976343,000458,00074.9%3618546,351233132ap1977
1980362,000473,00076.5%2432713,40787441ap1981
1987537,000631,00085.1%23153814,131195242ap1991
1999696,000801,00086.9%24133718,810153544ap2000
2000487,844560,74987.0%23143713,184173643ap2001
2001487,844560,74987.0%23123513,938185343ap2002
2002515,182606,09685.0%24113514,719173926ap2003
2003515,181606,09685.0%22113315,611174229ap2004
2004515,182606,09685.0%22103216,099144144ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 29 Jun 2013