Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidel María Cosío y Medina

Deceased

Bishop of Puno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1869BornAnansaya
1894²24.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cuzco, Peru
7 Jan 192353.7AppointedBishop of Puno, Peru
2 Sep 192354.3Ordained BishopBishop of Puno, Peru
17 Sep 192354.3InstalledBishop of Puno, Peru
14 May 193364.0DiedBishop of Puno, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fidel María Cosío y Medina:
Bishop Fidel María Cosío y Medina (born , died ) Bishop of Puno

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 50
  • b: LB, 8 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015