Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Falcón Iturrizaga

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1838Born
14 Jun 186224.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
20 Dec 186224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
25 Oct 189254.3SelectedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
19 Jan 189354.6ConfirmedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
29 Jun 189355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
1 May 190970.8DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Falcón Iturrizaga
Bishop Juan Antonio Falcón Iturrizaga (born , died ) Bishop of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopLa Concepción, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 235
  • b: LB, 6 Feb 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast