Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Pedro Carrión Pavlich

Bishop of Puno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1950 BornJunin
15 Aug 197626.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 200049.8AppointedBishop of Puno, Peru
7 May 200050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Puno, Peru

MicroData Summary for Jorge Pedro Carrión Pavlich:
Bishop Jorge Pedro Carrión Pavlich (born ) Bishop of Puno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Puno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,761
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013