Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Sánchez-Moreno Lira

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1925BornArequipa
4 Aug 195731.7Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
20 Feb 196135.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chiclayo, Peru
20 Feb 196135.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
30 Apr 196135.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
26 Apr 196842.4AppointedPrelate of Yauyos, Peru
10 Jan 197852.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
2 Mar 199670.3AppointedArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru
29 Nov 200378.0RetiredArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru
28 Sep 200983.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Luis Sánchez-Moreno Lira:
Archbishop Luis Sánchez-Moreno Lira (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Arequipa

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 11 May 2015