Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elio Alevi Pérez Tapia, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Juli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1946BornQuerocoto
6 Jun 197529.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Apr 200155.1AppointedPrelate of Juli, Peru
10 Jun 200155.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Juli, Peru
25 Jun 200559.3ResignedPrelate of Juli, Peru
5 Dec 200660.8DiedPrelate Emeritus of Juli, Peru

MicroData Summary for Elio Alevi Pérez Tapia:
Bishop Elio Alevi Pérez Tapia S.D.B. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Juli

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,992
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015