Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Pélach y Feliú

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Abancay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1917BornAnglés, Spain
6 Jan 194426.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 196850.7AppointedBishop of Abancay, Peru
14 Jul 196850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Abancay, Peru
1 Dec 199275.2RetiredBishop of Abancay, Peru
19 Jul 200789.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Abancay, Peru

MicroData Summary for Enrique Pélach y Feliú:
Bishop Enrique Pélach y Feliú (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Abancay

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 19 Sep 2013