Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Dermott Molloy McDermott

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huancavélica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1930BornDublin, Ireland
5 Jun 195525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
19 May 197646.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Huancavélica, Peru
19 May 197646.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
4 Jul 197646.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania
14 Jan 198251.6AppointedBishop of Huancavélica, Peru
18 Jun 200575.1RetiredBishop of Huancavélica, Peru
19 Aug 201383.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Huancavélica, Peru

MicroData Summary for William Dermott Molloy McDermott:
Bishop William Dermott Molloy McDermott (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huancavélica

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 19 Aug 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015