Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Keogh

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1884Born
13 Jun 190924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
8 Aug 193652.1AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
18 Oct 193652.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
25 Sep 196783.2RetiredBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
25 Sep 196783.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni
22 May 196984.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Keogh
Bishop Thomas Keogh (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGurteen

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jun 2017