Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Brendan Houlihan, S.P.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Eldoret


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1911BornBallyferriter, Ireland
18 Mar 193725.5Ordained PriestPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
29 Jan 195442.3AppointedPrefect of Eldoret, Kenya
19 Jul 196048.8AppointedBishop of Eldoret, Kenya
20 Nov 196049.2Ordained BishopBishop of Eldoret, Kenya
19 Oct 197059.1ResignedBishop of Eldoret, Kenya
19 Oct 197059.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Chunavia
24 Apr 197159.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Chunavia
2 Dec 197564.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Eldoret, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Joseph Brendan Houlihan:
Bishop Joseph Brendan Houlihan S.P.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Eldoret

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 118
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1975, Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013