Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Staunton

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1889BornBallyouskill, Ballyragget
22 Jun 191324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
10 Dec 193849.8AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
5 Feb 193949.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
27 Jun 196374.3DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Staunton:
Bishop James Staunton (born , died ) Bishop of Ferns

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015