Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paschal Charles David Robinson, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Ireland

Titular Archbishop of Tyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1870BornDublin, Ireland
21 Dec 190131.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 May 192757.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
24 Jun 192757.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyana
28 Nov 192959.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
27 Aug 194878.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Tyana

MicroData Summary for Paschal Charles David Robinson:
Archbishop Paschal Charles David Robinson O.F.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Ireland

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015