Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Igino Michelangelo Nuti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto, Egypt

Titular Bishop of Pupiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1883Born
28 Apr 190724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Dec 192138.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
20 Dec 192138.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pupiana
19 Mar 192239.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pupiana
26 Mar 192239.1InstalledVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
Mar 1949³66.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
21 Apr 196683.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto, Egypt

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Igino Michelangelo Nuti
Bishop Igino Michelangelo Nuti O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Egitto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pietro Agliana, Italy

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017