Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Mazzoli

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Bulgaria

Titular Archbishop of Germa in Hellesponto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1886BornFabriano, Italy
9 Jul 191124.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 193448.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bulgaria
15 Dec 193448.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Germa in Hellesponto
19 Mar 193548.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Germa in Hellesponto
8 Dec 194559.0DiedApostolic Delegate to Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Mazzoli:
Archbishop Giuseppe Mazzoli (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Bulgaria

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941, Page 396, and Page 779
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013