Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidro Sala Ribera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Abancay, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1933Born
28 Jul 195825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Solsona, Spain
18 Oct 198653.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Abancay, Peru
18 Oct 198653.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cluentum
14 Dec 198653.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cluentum
7 Apr 199057.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Abancay, Peru
1 Dec 199259.7SucceededBishop of Abancay, Peru
20 Jun 200976.2RetiredBishop of Abancay, Peru
26 Mar 201986.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Abancay, Peru

MicroData Summary for Isidro Sala Ribera
Bishop Isidro Sala Ribera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Abancay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergús, Spain
Death PlaceAbancay, Diocese of Abancay
Buried Place (Original)Mausoleum, Cathedral, Abancay, Diocese of Abancay

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2009
  • d: CB, 27 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 29 Mar 2019

Quantcast