Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Gabino Miranda Melgarejo

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1960 BornPiscaya
17 Dec 198727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Abancay, Peru
3 Jul 200444.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
3 Jul 200444.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
21 Aug 200444.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
24 May 201353.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
24 May 201353.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Usula
Jul 2013²53.4Laicized

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabino Miranda Melgarejo:
Layman Gabino Miranda Melgarejo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga

Please contact the (Layman) through the Archdiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,675
  • r: CB, 20 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013