Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto Gómez González

Bishop of Abancay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1952 BornAlbeos, Spain
14 Sep 197523.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tui-Vigo, Spain
22 Dec 200149.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Abancay, Peru
22 Dec 200149.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
16 Mar 200250.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
20 Jun 200957.3AppointedBishop of Abancay, Peru

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Gómez González:
Bishop Gilberto Gómez González (born ) Bishop of Abancay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Abancay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015