Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Antonio Ugarte Pérez

Archbishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1938 Born
27 Aug 196728.9Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
18 Aug 198344.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Abancay, Peru
18 Aug 198344.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Castrum
2 Oct 198345.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castrum
18 Oct 198648.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuzco, Peru
4 Dec 199153.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yauyos, Peru
15 Mar 199758.4AppointedPrelate of Yauyos, Peru
27 Apr 199758.5InstalledPrelate of Yauyos, Peru
29 Nov 200365.1AppointedArchbishop of Cuzco, Peru
28 Oct 201476.0RetiredArchbishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Ugarte Pérez
Archbishop Juan Antonio Ugarte Pérez (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cuzco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018