Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Busquets Jordá

Prelate Emeritus of Chuquibamba, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1935 Born
19 Mar 195823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Girona, Spain
25 Jan 200165.8AppointedPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru
24 Mar 200166.0Ordained BishopPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru
11 May 201580.1RetiredPrelate of Chuquibamba, Peru

MicroData Summary for Mario Busquets Jordá
Bishop Mario Busquets Jordá (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Chuquibamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilobi d'Onyar, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Chuquibamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,944
  • r: Bollettino, 11 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018