Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Estévanes y Seminario, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puno, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1838Born
4 Feb 186627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
27 Feb 188041.3AppointedBishop of Puno, Peru
29 Aug 188041.8Ordained BishopBishop of Puno, Peru
2 Oct 188041.9DiedBishop of Puno, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Estévanes y Seminario
Bishop Juan Estévanes y Seminario O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of Puno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuancabamba
Ordained BishopS. Maria in ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 14.6 years
  • a bishop for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 473
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017