Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placido Petacci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Achrida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1824Born
3 Apr 184722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Sep 184722.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 187954.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
12 May 187954.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
25 May 187954.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
13 Dec 188055.9AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
5 Mar 1885³60.1ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
27 Mar 188560.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
13 Aug 188560.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Placido Petacci (VIAF: 89362196)
Bishop Placido Petacci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSt Mary Major, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 73, and Page 553
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 568
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017