Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peregrini Tofoni

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1820BornGrottazzolina
10 Jun 184323.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 188060.5AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
29 Aug 188060.5Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
31 Jan 188362.9DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Peregrini Tofoni:
Bishop Peregrini Tofoni (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013