Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Porrati

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1825BornCastellazzo Bormida
15 Mar 185125.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 188055.0AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
29 Aug 188055.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
24 Feb 190276.5DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Porrati:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Porrati (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013