Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Celestino del Frate

Deceased

Archbishop of Camerino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1837BornMarino
23 Feb 186123.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188042.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Velletri, Italy
27 Feb 188042.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
14 Mar 188042.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria
31 Mar 188244.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Chile
6 Mar 188345.5ResignedApostolic Delegate to Chile
27 Mar 188547.5AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
21 May 189456.7AppointedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
26 Apr 190870.6DiedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Celestino del Frate:
Archbishop Celestino del Frate (born , died ) Archbishop of Camerino

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 176, and Page 306
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 553

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013