Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Achilles Rinaldini

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1818Born
18 Sep 184123.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 184224.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 187960.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
16 Mar 187960.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
17 Dec 188062.6DiedTitular Bishop of Cyrene

MicroData Summary for Achilles Rinaldini
Bishop Achilles Rinaldini (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Cyrene

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 236
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,879, Number 8
  • c34: CB, 14 Jun 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast