Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottaviano Rosario Sabetti, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1834Born
19 Sep 185217.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
20 Mar 185823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Oct 188046.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
22 Oct 188046.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
28 Oct 188046.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
28 Mar 188146.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano Rosario Sabetti
Bishop Ottaviano Rosario Sabetti C.SS.R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Calvi e Teano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoseto Valfortore
Ordained BishopS. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 291
  • bp/bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1880, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017