Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Remigio Pacini

Deceased

Bishop of Livorno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1820Born
31 Jul 184222.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 188060.5AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
29 Aug 188060.5Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
6 Jan 188665.9DiedBishop of Livorno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Remigio Pacini
Bishop Remigio Pacini (born , died ) Bishop of Livorno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColle di Val d'Elsa
Ordained BishopS. Maria in ara coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017