Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Anivitti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy

Titular Bishop of Carystus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1823Born
26 Sep 184724.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 188057.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
13 Dec 188057.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
27 Dec 188057.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
29 May 188157.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Anivitti (VIAF: 68740423)
Bishop Vincenzo Anivitti (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 187
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017