Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Bartoli

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1828Born
21 Dec 185022.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 188052.5AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
29 Aug 188052.5Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
17 Oct 189567.7DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Bartoli
Bishop Ignazio Bartoli (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfidardo
Ordained BishopS. Maria in ara coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 513
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017