Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio González Ruiz, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Puno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1923BornHuánuco
1 Jul 195229.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Mar 195935.6AppointedBishop of Puno, Peru
26 Apr 195935.8Ordained BishopBishop of Puno, Peru
1 Jul 197249.0ResignedBishop of Puno, Peru
6 Jan 198662.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Puno, Peru

MicroData Summary for Julio González Ruiz:
Bishop Julio González Ruiz S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Puno

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013