Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Juan Luciano Carlos Metzinger Greff, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Ayaviri, Peru

Titular Bishop of Autenti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1910Born
1 Oct 193322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
30 Jul 195847.5AppointedPrelate of Ayaviri, Peru
4 Apr 196453.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Autenti
9 May 196453.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Autenti
30 Jan 197160.0ResignedPrelate of Ayaviri, Peru
23 Oct 199281.8DiedPrelate Emeritus of Ayaviri, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Juan Luciano Carlos Metzinger Greff
Bishop José Juan Luciano Carlos Metzinger Greff SS.CC. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Ayaviri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOeting, France

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1992, Page 794
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018