Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Louis Fedders, M.M. †

Deceased

Prelate of Juli, Peru

Titular Bishop of Antiochia ad Maeandrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1913Born
11 Jun 194430.5Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
3 Aug 195743.6AppointedPrelate of Juli, Peru
29 Oct 196349.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiochia ad Maeandrum
12 Dec 196350.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiochia ad Maeandrum
11 Mar 197359.2DiedPrelate of Juli, Peru

MicroData Summary for Edward Louis Fedders
Bishop Edward Louis Fedders M.M. (born , died ) Prelate of Juli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCovington, KY, USA

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast