Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Joseph Soenneker

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1907Born
26 May 193426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
10 Mar 196153.7AppointedBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA
26 Apr 196153.9Ordained BishopBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA
30 Jun 198275.0RetiredBishop of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA
24 Sep 198780.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Owensboro, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Joseph Soenneker
Bishop Henry Joseph Soenneker (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Owensboro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelrose, MN

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017