Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Alberto Arce Masías

Deceased

Bishop of Piura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1903BornSimbale
30 Oct 192723.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 194541.6AppointedBishop of Tacna, Peru
15 Jul 194541.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tacna, Peru
17 Dec 195653.1AppointedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
6 Feb 195955.2AppointedBishop of Piura, Peru
6 Jan 196359.1DiedBishop of Piura, Peru

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto Arce Masías:
Bishop Carlos Alberto Arce Masías (born , died ) Bishop of Piura

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 36
  • c4: CB, 4 Aug 2014
  • c34: CB, 3 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Sep 2014